Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0924397
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59805402D 10.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE59805402 18.11.1998
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11257043Global Dossier 21.09.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0924397Global Dossier 04.09.2002B1
EP0924397 23.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1105235C 09.04.2003C
CN1221852 07.07.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19756018 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2178804T 01.01.2003T3
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100504638B 09.09.2005B1
KR19990063116 26.07.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6053137 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19756018 17.12.1997