blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0924397

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure24.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted04.09.2002
Opposition procedure05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.08.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:23.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991123
 
Event date:01.03.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:16.08.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010702
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:10.10.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59805402
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021010
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2178804 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:10.01.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:22.01.2003 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20021231
 
Event date:27.08.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030605
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20081121
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:27.02.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20081121
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.03.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20081122
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20081113
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:17.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20081117
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:09.10.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TQ
Code Expl.: PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:27.11.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:28.07.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20091118
 
Event date:27.08.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100730
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091130
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100601
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091118
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091118
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20111116
 
Event date:30.12.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091119