Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924397

EP0924397 - Device for feeding fluid and/or lubricant to a hydraulic apparatus in a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porscheplatz 1
70435 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Hydraulik-Ring GmbH
Weberstrasse 17
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft
Porscheplatz 1
70435 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH
Weberstrasse 17
D-72622 Nürtingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Trzmiel, Alfred
Albstrasse 9
72661 Grafenberg / DE
02 / Stephan, Wolfgang
Dobelstrasse 26
73087 Boll / DE
03 / Jochim, Axel-Willi
Im Mühlgarten 5
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[1999/25]
Application number, filing date98121877.918.11.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateDE199715601817.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19756018
[1999/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0924397
Date:23.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0924397
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01M11/08, F01M1/10
[1999/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/09]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Druck- und/oder Schmiermittelbeaufschlagung eines hydraulischen Verbrauchers in einer Brennkraftmaschine[1999/25]
English:Device for feeding fluid and/or lubricant to a hydraulic apparatus in a combustion engine[1999/25]
French:Dispositif pour alimenter en liquide sous pression ou/et en lubrifiant un appareil hydraulique d'un moteur à combustion interne[1999/25]
Examination procedure23.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2002Fee for grant paid
24.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2117662  (SUGANO SHINICHI) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US4714484  (KUEHL HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]FR1473127  (TECALEMIT) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 20 - page 2, column 2, line 46; figure - *;
 [A]US4614527  (REIMANN JOERG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US1775362  (DE MARCUS R T) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3623238  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2231508  (WARDTEC LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]FR1124271  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 3 * figure 2 *
by applicantDE3623238
 DE3937644