Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949592

EP0949592 - System for measuring or to identify oscillation or noise [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prüftechnik Dieter Busch AG
Oskar-Messter-Strasse 19-21
85737 Ismaning / DE
[1999/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Busch, Dieter
Am Isarberg 1
D-85737 Ismaning / DE
02 / Hermann, Michael
Roderstrasse 10
D-78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[1999/41]
Application number, filing date98121933.019.11.1998
[1999/41]
Priority number, dateDE1997220688U21.11.1997         Original published format: DE 29720688 U
[1999/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0949592
Date:13.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0949592
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07C3/00, G01D21/00, G01D5/00, G01D3/02, G01D18/00
[2000/15]
Former International [1999/41]G07C3/00, G01D21/00, G01D5/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/51]
Former [1999/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Messung oder Identifikation von Schwingungen oder Geräuschen[1999/41]
English:System for measuring or to identify oscillation or noise[1999/41]
French:Système de mesure ou d'identification d'oscillation ou de bruit[1999/41]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/29]
30.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0563713  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]US5355129  (BAUMANN BERND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]US5162725  (HODSON PRICE R [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 19; figure - *;
 [X]US5089979  (MCEACHERN ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO9500930  (BUSCH DIETER & CO PRUEFTECH [DE], et al) [AD] 3 * abstract *
by applicantWO9500930