Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0938010

EP0938010 - Device for positioning a mirror in a telescope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DORNIER GmbH
88039 Friedrichshafen / DE
[1999/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Hüther, Herbert
Isenweg 6
88239 Wangen / DE
02 / Barho, Reiner
Sonnhalde 6
88682 Salem-Neufrach / DE
[1999/34]
Application number, filing date98122034.620.11.1998
[1999/34]
Priority number, dateDE199810711920.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19807119
[1999/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0938010
Date:25.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0938010
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/182, G02B23/16
[1999/34]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/52]
Former [1999/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Positionierung eines Spiegels in einem Teleskop[1999/34]
English:Device for positioning a mirror in a telescope[1999/34]
French:Dispositif de positionnement de miroir d'un téléscope[1999/34]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/29]
06.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4723075  (GERMAN JOHN D [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 60 - column 7, line 27; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US4639589  (WEBER BERTHOLD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH09159838  ;
 [A]US5532872  (SAKAMOTO SHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 63 - line 67; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS63206005
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881222), vol. 012, no. 493, Database accession no. (E - 697), [A] 1,2 * abstract *