Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0945074

EP0945074 - Sweetening compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/17]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Harper, Heather Jean
5922 Beauty lane
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
02 / Henry, William John jr.
5428 Bayberry Court
Taylor Mill, Kentucky 41015 / US
03 / Roemer, Karin
Mozartstrasse 7
65812 Bad Soden / DE
04 / Fischer, Christa Maria
Hattersheimer Weg 2
65760 Eschborn / DE
05 / Mohlenklamp, Marvin Joseph
9113 Zoellner Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45251 / US
06 / Swaine, Robert Leslie jr.
36 East Sharon Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45251 / US
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [1999/39]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH
65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98122349.815.02.1994
[1999/39]
Priority number, dateUS1993001759016.02.1993         Original published format: US 17590
US1994018410928.01.1994         Original published format: US 184109
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0945074
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0945074
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0945074
Date:27.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/02, A23L2/38, A23L1/236
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/39]A23L1/236, A21D13/08, A23G3/30, C13F3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/39]
TitleGerman:Süssungsmittel[1999/39]
English:Sweetening compositions[1999/39]
French:Edulcorants[1999/39]
Examination procedure29.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
09.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2005Fee for grant paid
01.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94909660.6  / EP0684772
Opposition(s)30.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16]
Request for further processing for:02.11.2002Request for further processing filed
02.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]US4084010  (TSUNEMATSU TAKEMOTO ET AL.) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 4 - line 23 * * column 7, line 3 - line 15 *;
 [Y]JPS52143257  ;
 [Y]CN87101559  ;
 [Y]JPS58116674  ;
 [X]JPS5836368  ;
 [Y]CN10162072  ;
 [E]WO9418854  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [E] 1-6 * page 13, line 20 - line 32 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 03, Database accession no. 78-05150A, XP002122310 & JPS52143257 A 19771129 (NIPPON SHOJI KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 47, Database accession no. 88-330534, XP002122311 & CN87101559 A 19871125 (APPLICATION TECH IN) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830929), vol. 007, no. 219, Database accession no. (C - 188), & JP58116674 A 19830711 (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - "Intense sweetener from Lo Han Kuo (Momordica grosvenori)", EXPERIENTIA, (19750515), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 533 - 534, XP002122306 [Y] 1-6 * page 534, column 1, paragraph 2 * * see the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01932442
 [YD]  - KATSUHIRO MATSUMOTO ET AL., "Minor Cucurbitane-Glycosides from fruits of Siraitia grosvenori (Cucurbitaceae)", CHEM.PHARM.BULL., (1990), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 2030 - 2032, XP002122307 [YD] 1-6 * see the abstract, p.2030, left col., first paragraph *
 [Y]  - H.C.MAKAPUGAY ET AL., "High-Performance Liquid Chromatographic Analysis of the Major Sweet principle of Lo Han Kuo Fruits", J.AGRIC.FOOD CHEM., (19850504), vol. 33, pages 348 - 350, XP002122308 [Y] 1-6 * see p.348, the abstract; page 348, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 349, column 2, paragraph L * * page 350, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00063a007
 [YD]  - RYOJI KASAI ET AL., "Sweet Cucurbitane Gylcosides from fruits of Siraitia siamensis (chi-zi luo-han-guo), a Chinese Folk Medicine", AGRIC.BIOL.CHEM., (1989), vol. 53, no. 12, pages 3347 - 3349, XP002122309 [YD] 1-6 * page 3347, column L *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 15, Database accession no. 83-35358K, XP002122312 & JPS5836368 A 19830303 (MARUZEN KASEI KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 10, Database accession no. 93-077012, XP002122313 & CN10162072 A 19920624 (HUILONGYU TEA FACTORY) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *