Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978235

EP0978235 - Device for derinding pork meat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gugg, Anton
Herzog-Odilo-Strasse 19
5310 Mondsee / AT
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen
Neubauer - Liebl
Patentanwälte
Fauststrasse 30
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys.
Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date98122427.226.11.1998
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE1998214162U07.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29814162 U
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978235
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A22C17/12
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Entschwartungsgerät für Schweinefleisch[2000/06]
English:Device for derinding pork meat[2000/06]
French:Dispositif pour découenner la viande de porc[2000/06]
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/50]
12.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE4133361  (GUGG ANTON [AT]) [DA] 1,2 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2627058  (FOURMENTIN JACQUES [FR]);
 [A]FR2391039  (VARLET SA CONST MECA [FR]);
 [A]FR2651963  (TOURNIER PRODUITS PROCEDES [FR])
by applicantDE4133361