EP0922604 - Control methods for a shift by wire vehicle transmission including determining clutch status [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Transmission Corporation 2135 West Maple Road Troy, Michigan, 48084 / US | For all designated states WABCO STANDARD GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2005/11] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states ZF Meritor, LLC 5275 Skyway Church Road Maxton, NC 28364 / US | ||
For all designated states WABCO STANDARD GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | ||
For all designated states WABCO STANDARD GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Jon M. 11540 Fairway Drive Laurinburg, North Carolina 28352 / US | 02 /
Böhm, Andreas Bergstrasse 10 30974 Wennigsen / DE | 03 /
Böckmann, Gerhard Tilsiter Strasse 1 30880 Laatzen / DE | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122536.0 | 30.11.1998 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | US19970988465 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: US 988465 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0922604 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0922604 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922604 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/08, F16H61/04, F16H59/56, F16D48/10, // B60K41/28, F16H61/02 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
F16H61/0248 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
F16H59/56 (EP,US);
B60W2050/143 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0208 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1005 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H2059/363 (EP,US);
F16H2312/02 (EP,US);
F16H59/36 (EP,US);
F16H59/42 (EP,US);
F16H59/46 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | B60K41/08, F16H61/04, F16H59/56, // B60K41/28, F16H61/02 | ||
Former IPC [1999/24] | B60K41/08, F16H61/04, // B60K41/28, F16H61/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/51] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung eines Getriebes mit elektrischer Schaltbetätigung, insbesondere mit Bestimmung der Kupplungsstellung | [1999/24] | English: | Control methods for a shift by wire vehicle transmission including determining clutch status | [1999/24] | French: | Système de commande électrique de changement de vitesse avec détermination de l'état de l'embrayage | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4711141 (SPERANZA DONALD [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0697302 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0241216 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5411124 (OLSON OTIS J [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4646891 (BRAUN EUGENE R [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | Examination | US4712658 | EP0884212 | by applicant | WO9744210 |