Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0922451

EP0922451 - Microcapsules containing seminal material for artificial insemination in pigs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/24]Microcapsules containing seminal material for artificial insemination in pigs
[1999/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LA CORTE DE' MONACI S.A.S. di Zanotti Adelino & C.
Piazzetta Caduti sul Lavoro, 2
Crema (CR) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
LA CORTE DE'MONACI S.A.S. di Zanotti Adelino & C.
Piazzetta Caduti sul Lavoro, 2
Crema (CR) / IT
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Università di Pavia
Via Taramelli 12
27100 Pavia / IT
For all designated states
UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI MILANO
Via Festa del Perdono, 7
I-20122 Milan / IT
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI MILANO
Via Festa del Perdono, 7
I-20122 Milan / IT
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
UNIVERSITA' DEGLI STUDI DI PAVIA
Strada Nuova, 65
I-27100 Pavia / IT
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
Università di Pavia
Via Taramelli 12
27100 Pavia / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Conte, Ubaldo
Via Treviglio 6
21052 Busto Arsizio / IT
02 / Torre, Maria Luisa Marina
Viale Libertà 6
27100 Pavia / IT
03 / Maggi, Lauretta
Via Folperti 3
27100 Pavia / IT
04 / Giunchedi, Paolo
Via Cairoli 4
27051 Cava Manara / IT
05 / Vigo, Daniele
Via Marconi 23
27046 Santa Giuletta / IT
06 / Maffeo, Giovanni
Viale Rimembranze 36/B
20075 Lodi / IT
07 / Russo, Vincenzo
Via Lattuada 2
20135 Milan / IT
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
Former [1999/24]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr.
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98122633.527.11.1998
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0265228.11.1997         Original published format: IT MI972652
[1999/24]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0922451
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0922451
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0922451
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/52, A01N1/02, A61K35/52
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:Spermamaterial enthaltende Mikrokapseln für künstliche Besamung von Schweinen[1999/26]
English:Microcapsules containing seminal material for artificial insemination in pigs[1999/32]
French:Microcapsules contenant du matériau de sperme pour l' insémination artificielle chez le cochon[1999/32]
Former [1999/24]Spermamaterial enthaltende Mikrokapseln für künstliche Besamung von Schweine
Former [1999/24]Microcapsules containing seminal material for artificial insemination in pigs
Former [1999/24]Microcapsules contenant du matériau de sperme pour l'insémination artificielle chez le cochon
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
03.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2003Fee for grant paid
11.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
SE25.09.2003
LU27.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
SE25.09.2003
LU27.11.2003
Former [2004/10]CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]CH25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Former [2004/01]CH25.06.2003
LI25.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS62195284  ;
 [Y]JPH01128787  ;
 [A]US4840891  (VAN BLERKOM JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-22 * claim - *
 [DY]  - R.L. NEBEL ET AL., "MICROENCAPSULATION OF BOVINE SPERMATOZOA FOR USE IN ARTIFICIAL INSEMINATION: A REVIEW.", REPRODUCTION, FERTILITY AND DEVELOPMENT, MELBOURNE, AU, (1993), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 701 - 712, XP000891485 [DY] 1-22 * page 703, line 17 - page 704, line 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/RD9930701
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880212), vol. 012, no. 047, Database accession no. (C - 475), & JP62195284 A 19870828 (KIBUN KK) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890817), vol. 013, no. 372, Database accession no. (C - 627), & JP01128787 A 19890522 (KOMATSU LTD) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *