Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921670

EP0921670 - Electronic scheduling devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Communications, Inc.
900 Broken Sound Parkway
Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US
[2005/41]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc.
900 Broken Sound Parkway
Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shaffer, Shmuel
1211 Cowper Street
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
02 / Beyda, William J.
21580 Edward Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Siemens House
Oldbury, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Allen, Derek
Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date98122857.001.12.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateUS1997098538804.12.1997         Original published format: US 985388
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0921670
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0921670
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921670
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, G06F17/60
[2003/25]
Former International [1999/23]H04M3/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/11]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Planungsgeräte[1999/23]
English:Electronic scheduling devices[1999/23]
French:Appareils de planification électroniques[1999/23]
Examination procedure04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2005Fee for grant paid
03.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9821870  (ROLM SYSTEMS [US]) [PX] 1-5,8-15 * page 3, line 17 - page 7, line 10 * * page 10, line 6 - page 12, line 7 * * page 19, line 9 - page 21, line 19 *;
 [Y]US5303145  (GRIFFIN SUSAN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 36 * * column 4, line 51 - column 62 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 7 *;
 [Y]US5113380  (LEVINE ALFRED B [US]) [Y] 1-13,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - line 20 * * column 8, line 35 - column 10, line 6 *