blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0920888

EP0920888 - Ski having binding mounting portion for angled boot orientation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K2 Corporation
19215 Vashon Highway S.W.
Vashon, WA 98070-5236 / US
[1999/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Higgins, Stephen D.
7795 Cabrini Drive Southeast
Port Orchard, Washington 98367 / US
02 / DeRocco, Anthony O.
4720 - 48th Avenue South
Seattle, Washington 98118 / US
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Schulz, Rütger, et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Schulz, Rütger, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98122904.002.12.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateUS1997098569905.12.1997         Original published format: US 985699
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0920888
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0920888
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920888
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A63C5/00, A63C9/00
[2000/05]
CPC:
A63C9/00 (EP,US); A63C5/003 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/23]A63C5/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2000/41]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Skibindungsmontageplatte mit einstellbarem Winkel[1999/23]
English:Ski having binding mounting portion for angled boot orientation[1999/23]
French:Ski avec plaque d'appui ayant une inclinaison longitudinale[1999/23]
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
02.04.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2003Fee for grant paid
30.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03006598.1  / EP1325767
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4007946  (SARVER JOHN JEFFERY) [X] 1,2,9-12 * figure 7 * [A] 14,15,21-25,31-33,36-39;
 [XA]US3675938  (SIGL JON D) [X] 1,2,9-12 * figure 11 * [A] 14,15,21-25,31-33,36-39;
 [A]US5026086  (GUERS FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,5,9-12,14,17,21-25,31-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5232241  (KNOTT WALTER P [US], et al) [A] 1,3,14,16,25,31,32,34 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.