Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923865

EP0923865 - Pesticidal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Yasuyori
2-11-7-303, Sonehigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Katayama, Yasuyuki
3-9-6-1-303. Kurosuna, Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
[1999/25]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/25]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98123080.810.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateJP1997034620216.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34620297
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0923865
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0923865
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/18, A01N53/00, A01N47/04, A01N25/12, A01N25/16, A01N53/04
[2000/15]
Former International [1999/25]A01N25/18, A01N53/00, A01N47/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pestizide Zusammensetzung[1999/25]
English:Pesticidal composition[1999/25]
French:Composition pesticide[1999/25]
Examination procedure06.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
13.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
05.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0639331  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-9 * CROPU: AN-1996-89255, *Page 1, lines 14-34; Page 2, line 23; Examples 1-7*;
 [Y]  DATABASE STN CROPU, Database accession no. 1996-89255, XP002127547 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [Y]  DATABASE STN CROPU, Database accession no. 1998-86147, XP002127548 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *