Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924220

EP0924220 - Inhibitor of the activation of beta-glucan recognition protein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8605 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd.
1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-8605 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katsumi, Yoichi
6-1, Takadacho
Amagasaki-Shi, Hyougo 661-0963 / JP
[1999/25]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1999/25]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98123316.608.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateJP1997036396016.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36396097
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924220
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924220
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/00, C08B37/18, C12Q1/00
[1999/25]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/01]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Inhibitor für die Aktivierung eines Erkennungsproteins für beta-Glucan[1999/25]
English:Inhibitor of the activation of beta-glucan recognition protein[1999/25]
French:Inhibiteur de l'activation d'une protéine reconnaissant le beta-glucane[2006/10]
Former [1999/25]Inhibiteur de l'activation d'une protéine reconnaissant de beta-glucane
Examination procedure13.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
20.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/50]
28.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0397880  (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 *Preparation example 9*;; claims 1,9,14,18,19 * [Y] 10-22;
 [YD]EP0270039  (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [YD] 10-22 * page 1; claims 1-3,13 *;
 [XY]EP0333187  (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * example 2; claims 1,3 * [Y] 10-22;
 [A]WO8302123  (SOEDERHAELL KENNETH TORD) [A] 10-22 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 19 *;
 [X]EP0330991  (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 *Reference example 1*; page 3, lines 11-39; claims 1,3,4 *
 [X]  ARBRECHT A ET AL, "ACETYLATION OF A BETA-1,6-BRANCHED BETA-1,3-GLUCAN, YIELDING SCHIZOPHYLLAN-ACETATE", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS,GB,APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERSLTD. BARKING, (19940101), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 193 - 197, XP000469048 [X] 1-9 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0144-8617(94)90130-9
 [X]  SAKAGAMI H ET AL, DIVERSE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF PSK (KRESTIN), A PROTEIN-BOUND POLYSACCHARIDE FROM CORIOLUS VERSICOLOR (FR.) QUEL, MUSHROOM BIOL. AND MUSHROOM PROD. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE,XX,XX, PAGE(S) 237-245, XP002063489 [X] 1-4,6-9 *iNTRODUCTION*