Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924894

EP0924894 - Method for generating pseudo-random data words to be used for encryption [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heeke, Helmut
Anton-Meindl-Strasse 3E
81245 München / DE
[1999/25]
Application number, filing date98123376.008.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateDE199715737022.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757370
[1999/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924894
Date:23.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924894
Date:07.03.2001
[2001/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/22, H04L9/26
[2001/10]
Former International [1999/25]H04L9/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/48]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung pseudo-zufälliger Datenworte zur Verschlüsselung[1999/25]
English:Method for generating pseudo-random data words to be used for encryption[1999/25]
French:Procédé de génération de mots pseudoaléatoires pour le chiffrage[1999/25]
Examination procedure06.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
05.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4860353  (BROWN DAVID S [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 30 * * Abstract *;
 [A]US5432853  (YAMAMOTO SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1,7,10,12 * figures 2,5 * * column 3, line 19 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 8 * * column 8, line 37 - column 8, line 44 * * column 9, line 1 - column 9, line 17 *;
 [A]US5079733  (ANTOINE PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-6,8,12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 64 * * column 5, line 22 - column 5, line 31 * * column 5, line 49 - column 5, line 56 * * column 6, line 6 - column 6, line 20 *;
 [A]US4817145  (GUENTHER CHRISTOPH-GEORG [CH]) [A] 1,3-6,11,12 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 44 *