EP0925744 - Thermoventilating sanitising device for shoe-racks and wardrobes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daldossi, Umberto via Uccelli 11/A 24100 Bergamo / IT | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni STUDIO NORD BREVETTI Via Ariberto 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Lecce, Giovanni STUDIO NORD BREVETTI Via G. Verdi, 14 24100 Bergamo / IT | Application number, filing date | 98123389.3 | 09.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02750 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: IT MI972750 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0925744 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0925744 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B61/00, A47B61/04, A47L23/20 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A47B61/00 (EP);
A47B61/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | A47B61/00, A47B61/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | Thermobelüftende Reinigungsvorrichtung für Schuhgestelle und Schränke | [1999/26] | English: | Thermoventilating sanitising device for shoe-racks and wardrobes | [1999/26] | French: | Dispositif thermoventilant de nettoyage pour des casiers de chaussures et des armoires | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/40] | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0752224 (DALDOSSI UMBERTO) [Y] 1-4,7,8,14 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 * [A] 6; | [Y]DE3324781 (MARKUS RAINER) [Y] 1-4,7,8,14 * abstract * * claim 2 *; | [A]EP0627519 (DHAEMERS GREGORY L) [A] 1,12,15 * abstract * * column 7, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE2852762 (BREITSAMER HANS) [A] 1,11 * figures 1-9; claim 1 * |