Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0935082

EP0935082 - Electromagnetic brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanyo Kogyo Co., Ltd.
29-2, 2-chome, Minamikenda Suita-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
Sanyo Kogyo Co., Ltd.
29-2, 2-chome, Minamikenda
Suita-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hikari, Kazuo, Sanyo Kogyo Co., Ltd.
29-2, 2-chome, Minamikenda
Suita-shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98123523.716.12.1998
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateJP1998003965305.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3965398
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0935082
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0935082
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0935082
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16D55/227, F16D59/02
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/34]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektromagnetische Bremse[1999/32]
English:Electromagnetic brake[1999/32]
French:Frein électromagnétique[1999/32]
Examination procedure08.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
11.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2002Fee for grant paid
12.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3357528  (AUGUSTE VERLINDE) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [XA]GB1089987  (MATERIEL ELECTROMAGNETIQUE S I) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 43 - line 110; figures 1,3 * [A] 4,5;
 [A]EP0796814  (SANYO KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4,5 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 56 * * figures 6,10 *