Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0930430

EP0930430 - Intake module for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Söhlke, Günter Dipl.-Ing.
Beethovenstrasse 31
38518 Gifhorn / DE
02 / Lagies, Dietmar Dipl.-Ing.
Zu dem Balken 7
38448 Wolfsburg / DE
03 / Kirchner, Michael Dipl.-Designer
Lasker-Schueler-Ring 25
38446 Wolfsburg / DE
04 / Jahrens, Hans-Ulrich Dipl.-Ing.
Heideweg 12 b
38120 Braunschweig / DE
05 / Erfurt, Jakob Dipl.-Ing.
Schwalbeneinkel 9
38468 Ehra-Lessien / DE
[1999/29]
Application number, filing date98123694.612.12.1998
[1999/29]
Priority number, dateDE199810207421.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19802074
[1999/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0930430
Date:21.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0930430
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930430
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02M35/10, F02M31/07
[1999/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/01]
Former [1999/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ansaugmodul für eine Brennkraftmaschine[1999/29]
English:Intake module for a combustion engine[1999/29]
French:Module d'admission pour moteur à combustion[1999/29]
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
05.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2002Fee for grant paid
15.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE417857  (AUDIWERKE A G) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2987138  (WALTON GEORGE M) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4058099  (SAITO TAIJI) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2520811  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [DA]DE4402048  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]);
 [DA]DE4403219  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE])
by applicantDE4402048
 DE4403219