Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928711

EP0928711 - Linkage for soft top compartment lid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edscha Cabrio-Dachsysteme GmbH
Scharwächterstrasse 5
94491 Hengersberg / DE
[2001/18]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
Edscha Cabrio-Verdecksysteme GmbH + Co.
Scharwächterstrasse 5
94491 Hengersberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haberl, Franz
Hasreit 11
94574 Wallerfing / DE
02 / Striegl, Theodor
Panzinger Weg 18
84140 Gangkofen / DE
[1999/28]
Representative(s)Sparing, Rolf Klaus
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Sparing, Rolf Klaus, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing.
c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Ing. Horst Bonnekamp Bankstrasse 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/28]Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur
Sonnleiten 7
84164 Moosthenning / DE
Application number, filing date98123700.112.12.1998
[1999/28]
Priority number, dateDE199810038408.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19800384
[1999/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0928711
Date:14.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0928711
Date:18.08.1999
[1999/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0928711
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60J7/20
[1999/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/17]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verdeckkastendeckelanlenkung[1999/28]
English:Linkage for soft top compartment lid[1999/28]
French:Articulation pour couvercle de coffre de capote[1999/28]
Examination procedure14.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/28]
04.02.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
11.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2001Fee for grant paid
23.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19525587  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 17 *;
 [A]FR2696375  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [PA]EP0846584  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [PA] 1,3 * abstract *