Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0935029

EP0935029 - Fitting, particularly sanitary fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2001 [2001/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MELOH-ARMATUREN RUPPEL & MELOH GmbH
Im Mühlental 17
58642 Iserlohn / DE
[1999/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Wagner, Andreas
Löherweg 29
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
02 / Schröder, Rüdiger
Büttmeckerweg 32
58675 Hemer / DE
[1999/32]
Application number, filing date98123702.712.12.1998
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateDE199810381731.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19803817
[1999/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0935029
Date:11.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0935029
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E03C1/04
[1999/32]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/37]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Armatur, insbesondere Wasserarmatur[1999/32]
English:Fitting, particularly sanitary fitting[1999/32]
French:Robinetterie, en particulier robinetterie d'eau[1999/32]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
23.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5358213  (PILOLLA JOSEPH J [US]) [X] 1,3,6 * column 1, line 33 - column 1, line 53; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 4,5;
 [XA]US4604764  (ENZO FAVA [IT]) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1,6,7; claim 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE4308746  (SANHA KAIMER KG [DE]) [A] 2 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4341649  (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 42 - column 2, line 52; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4803416  (ABIVEN JACQUES [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 2 - column 3, line 7 *