Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011108

EP1011108 - Device for making cables with alternating twist direction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rosendahl Maschinen GmbH
Schachen 57
8212 Pischelsdorf / AT
[2004/04]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Seibert, Gerhard
Am Flachhard 3
2500 Baden / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Seibert, Gerhard
Am Flachhard 3
2500 Baden / AT
 [2004/04]
Former [2000/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hehenberger, Reinhard , et al
BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Hehenberger, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Otto Beer, Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer, Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger, Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98123749.814.12.1998
[2000/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011108
Date:21.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011108
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01B13/02, D07B5/10
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
Former [2001/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT 
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI19.12.2000
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verseilen von Kabeln mit wechselnder Schlagrichtung[2000/25]
English:Device for making cables with alternating twist direction[2000/25]
French:Dispositif de câblage à sens alterné[2000/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
22.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
24.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR28.04.2004
[2008/24]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0821372  (SCHWECHATER KABELWERKE GES MBH [AT]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2; claims 1,8 *;
 [A]EP0749131  (SEIBERT GERHARD [AT]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3607443  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, line 44 - line 50 *;
 [A]EP0867894  (SEIBERT GERHARD [AT])