Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936294

EP0936294 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
72760 Reutlingen / DE
[2003/12]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
H. Stoll GmbH & Co.
Stollweg 1
D-72760 Reutlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stoll, Thomas
Memminger Str.7
72762 Reutlingen / DE
02 / Schmid, Franz
Eichenweg 20
72411 Bodelshausen / DE
[1999/33]
Representative(s)Möbus, Daniela
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date98123873.616.12.1998
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateDE199810164317.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801643
[1999/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0936294
Date:18.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0936294
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936294
Date:19.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:D04B1/22, D04B15/38
[1999/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2000/50]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine[1999/33]
English:Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine[1999/33]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne[1999/33]
Examination procedure13.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2002Fee for grant paid
20.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3861176  (MCWHIRTER JOE R, et al) [A] 1 * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]DE4032402  (MENNINGER IRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - line 63 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3524220  (STOLL & CO H [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US1893808  (BENJAMIN SPECTOR);
 [A]WO8808893  (IRO AB [SE])