Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924842

EP0924842 - Reversing mechanism for electric motors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2006/11]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Karasa, Alvydas P.
2214 Cloverdale Drive
Fallston, Maryland 21161 / US
02 / Howard, Thomas J. Jr.
1307 Bermoudy Road
Whitehall, Maryland 21161 / US
[1999/25]
Representative(s)Shaya, Darrin Maurice , et al
Black & Decker Europe
210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Shaya, Darrin Maurice , et al
Black & Decker Europe, European Group Headquarters, 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date98124094.818.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateUS1997099417219.12.1997         Original published format: US 994172
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924842
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924842
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0924842
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K23/66, H02K23/18
[1999/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/48]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Umschaltmechanismus für einen Elektromotor[1999/25]
English:Reversing mechanism for electric motors[1999/25]
French:Inverseur de marche pour un moteur électrique[1999/25]
Examination procedure18.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/25]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2005Fee for grant paid
12.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05012994.9  / EP1583206
EP05013212.5  / EP1583207
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US5089729  (MOORES JR ROBERT G) [XD] 1,2,9,14 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 8; figure - * [Y] 8,11;
 [Y]EP0778655  (MARQUARDT GMBH) [Y] 8,11 * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0224053  (BLACK & DECKER INC) [A] 4,5,15 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 9; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4968922  (BITTEL ROBERT W) [A] 4,5,15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE9104784U  (KRESS-ELEKTRIK) [A] 4,5,15 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2897302  (J.H.GODFREY) [A] 4,5,15 * figure - *