blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994209 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994209



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 89
22.09.2001 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
23.03.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.12.2000 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 2
27.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 2
14.04.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
03.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
03.03.1999 Description Search / examination 8
03.03.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
03.03.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 15
07.01.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.12.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.1998 Drawings Search / examination 6
18.12.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.12.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
18.12.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 10