Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994209

EP0994209 - A method and a machine for finishing of fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.11.2001 [2001/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLAINOX S.r.l.
Via Giacomo Leopardi, 5
I-13010 Quaregna (Biella) / IT
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Bozzo, Giovanni
Via Giotto, 9
13854 Quaregna (Biella) / IT
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Marchitelli, Mauro , et al
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Marchitelli, Mauro , et al
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6
10133 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98124108.618.12.1998
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0079317.09.1998         Original published format: IT TO980793
[2000/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994209
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:D06B3/26, D06C19/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting states[2000/52]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Maschine zur Veredlung von textilen Warenbahnen[2000/16]
English:A method and a machine for finishing of fabrics[2000/16]
French:Procédé et machine pour l'anoblissement d'étoffes textiles[2000/16]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/46]
23.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0215745  (BIANCALINI & C FIORENZO MEC [IT], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,6 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 5 *;
 [A]US3330134  (CARPENTER WILLIAM T) [A] 9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4055003  (SACK GEORGES H)