Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924753

EP0924753 - Etching method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.02.2002  [2002/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Izawa, Mitsutaka c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1999/25]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124133.418.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateJP1997035082619.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35082697
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924753
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924753
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3213, C23F4/00
[1999/46]
Former International [1999/25]H01L21/3213
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/37](deleted) 
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ätzmethode[1999/25]
English:Etching method[1999/25]
French:Procédé de gravure[1999/25]
Examination procedure24.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
18.12.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5411631  (HORI MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, lines 18-54 * [A] 2;
 [A]US5540812  (KADOMURA SHINGO [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, lines 47-67 * * examples 2,3 *;
 [A]US4267013  (IIDA SHINYA, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 10-31 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5277750  (FRANK WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 66 *;
 [A]EP0485802  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 4,6,7 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 19 *;
 [A]WO9730472  (LAM RES CORP [US]) [A] 4,6 * page 9, line 25 - page 18, line 2 *;
 [A]  LABELLE C B ET AL, "Metal stack etching using a helical resonator plasma", PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF SEMICONDUCTOR INTERFACES. 23RD ANNUAL CONFERENCE, LA JOLLA, CA, USA, 21-25 JAN. 1996, Journal of Vacuum Science & Technology B (Microelectronics and Nanometer Structures), July-Aug. 1996, AIP for American Vacuum Soc, USA, vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 2574 - 2581, XP002116315 [A] 4,6 * page 2578, column R, paragraph 3 - page 2580, column R, line 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.588770