Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927964

EP0927964 - A method for utilizing the postal service address as an object in an object oriented environment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2011Opposition rejectedpublished on 07.09.2011  [2011/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pitney Bowes Inc.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road
Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
PITNEY BOWES INC.
World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road
Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gardner, David P.
6 Santa Lane
New Milford, CT 06776 / US
02 / Pierce, Jeffrey D.
4 Naples Avenue
Norwalk, CT 06855 / US
[1999/27]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124254.818.12.1998
[1999/27]
Priority number, dateUS1997099770823.12.1997         Original published format: US 997708
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0927964
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0927964
Date:28.06.2000
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927964
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/02
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/10]
Former [1999/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein Verfahren zur Verwendung der Postdienstadresse als Objekt innerhalb einer objektorientierten Umgebung[1999/27]
English:A method for utilizing the postal service address as an object in an object oriented environment[1999/27]
French:Un procédé d' utilisation de l'adresse postale comme objet dans un environnement de programmation orienté objet[1999/27]
Examination procedure21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
22.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2008Fee for grant paid
20.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.11.2009   
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Opponent's representative
Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/52]
Opponent(s)01  18.11.2009   
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Opponent's representative
Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
30.12.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.04.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.03.2011Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/36]
29.03.2011Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2011Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US5546577  (MARLIN JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 7; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5379426  (FOSS CAROLYN L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 6; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5606609  (HOUSER PETER B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0735722  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 13, line 12 - line 42; figure 1; claim 1 *
by applicantUS4858907
 US5326181
 US5175691
 US5278947
 US5583970