Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0908472

EP0908472 - Olefin polymerization catalyst precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Job, Robert Charles
12126 Westmere
Houston, Texas 77077 / US
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98124309.016.10.1991
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateUS1990059955018.10.1990         Original published format: US 599550
US1990059953818.10.1990         Original published format: US 599538
US1990059961018.10.1990         Original published format: US 599610
US1990060078122.10.1990         Original published format: US 600781
US1990060089822.10.1990         Original published format: US 600898
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908472
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908472
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0908472
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/658, C08F10/00
[1999/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/15]
TitleGerman:Olefinpolymerisationskatalysatorvorläufer[1999/15]
English:Olefin polymerization catalyst precursor[1999/15]
French:Précurseur de catalyseur de polymérisation d'oléfines[1999/15]
Examination procedure21.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/15]
23.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2002Fee for grant paid
19.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91309518.8  / EP0481749
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.07.2002
CH17.07.2002
GR17.07.2002
LI17.07.2002
LU16.10.2002
DK17.10.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2003/46]AT17.07.2002
CH17.07.2002
GR17.07.2002
LI17.07.2002
DK17.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT17.07.2002
CH17.07.2002
GR17.07.2002
LI17.07.2002
Former [2003/20]GR17.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0376188  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1 * * claims 1,2,8 *