Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0926245

EP0926245 - Method for detection of carcinoma of the urinary bladder within a urine sample [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 112-132
68305 Mannheim-Waldhof / DE
[1999/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Emrich, Thomas, Dr.
Blombergstrasse 9
82393 Iffeldorf / DE
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124326.421.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateDE199715730022.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757300
[1999/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926245
Date:30.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926245
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0926245
Date:22.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[1999/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2003/23]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nachweis von Harnblasenkarzinom in einer Urinprobe[1999/26]
English:Method for detection of carcinoma of the urinary bladder within a urine sample[1999/26]
French:Procédé pour la détection d'un carcinome de la vessie dans un échantillon d'urine[1999/26]
Examination procedure21.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/26]
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2004Fee for grant paid
15.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
AT21.12.2004
DK22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
[2006/34]
Former [2006/14]IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
Former [2005/51]IE22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE31.12.2004
Former [2005/46]IE22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/24]IE22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO9735871  (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [XD] 1-5,14-16 * page 7, line 6 - page 12, line 30 *;
 [XY]WO9718322  (DAHM MICHAEL W [DE]) [X] 1-10,12-16 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 2 - page 20, paragraph 3 * * claims 1,2,5,7,21,26,28,30 * [Y] 11;
 [XA]WO9601835  (GERON CORP [US], et al) [X] 14 * page 35, line 28 * * page 38, line 4 * * page 51, line 33 - page 54, line 9 * * page 80, line 10 * * examples 1,2,5,6,11 * * claims 36,38 * [A] 1-13,15,16;
 [Y]WO9625949  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [Y] 11 * in particular: SEQ ID Nos. 1 and 2; page 26, line 1 - page 27, line 3 *;
 [XDY]  - KINOSHITA HIDEFUMI ET AL, "Detection of telomerase activity in exfoliated cells in urine from patients with bladder cancer.", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE (BETHESDA), (19970521), vol. 89, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8874, pages 724 - 730, XP001094967 [XD] 1-5,10,14-16 * page 725, column L, paragraph 3 - column M, paragraph 1 * [Y] 11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/89.10.724
 [XY]  - YOSHIDA KAZUHIRO ET AL, "Telomerase activity in bladder carcinoma and its implication for noninvasive diagnosis by detection of exfoliated cancer cells in urine.", CANCER, (19970115), vol. 79, no. 2, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 362 - 369, XP001094969 [X] 1-5,10,14-16 * page 363, column R, paragraph 3 - page 364, column R, paragraph 1 * * figure 3 * [Y] 11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19970115)79:2<362::AID-CNCR20>3.0.CO;2-Y
 [PXY]  - MÜLLER M ET AL, "Comparison of human telomerase RNA and telomerase activity in urine for diagnosis of bladder cancer.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH: AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. UNITED STATES AUG 1998, (199808), vol. 4, no. 8, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1949 - 1954, XP001093807 [PX] 1-5,7-10,12-16 * abstract * * page 1950, column L, paragraph 4 - page 1951, column L, paragraph 1 * [PY] 11