blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0926245 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0926245



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 185
27.07.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.01.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.03.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.03.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
12.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.12.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
12.12.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Description Search / examination 14
11.12.2003 Description Search / examination 13
11.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Annex Search / examination 6
28.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
28.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
27.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.08.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.08.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
25.08.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.08.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
06.08.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.01.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
21.12.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
21.12.1998 Description Search / examination 22
21.12.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1998 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
21.12.1998 Priority document Search / examination 32
21.12.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
21.12.1998 Sequence listing Search / examination 2