blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0926245


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2006  [2006/34]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
29.07.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.09.2005  [2005/37]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
21.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]
06.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
26.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.12.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.12.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.08.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
20.08.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
04.06.2003 Examination report or reply
18.04.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
28.02.2003 First examination report
24.02.2003 Examination report or reply
20.12.2002 Renewal fee
02.08.2002 Publication of search report published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
21.12.2001 Renewal fee
20.12.2000 Renewal fee
13.05.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]
13.05.1999 Request for examination filed published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]