blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0926245
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59811990D 28.10.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE59811990 21.12.1998
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11243995Global Dossier 14.09.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0926245Global Dossier 22.09.2004B1
EP0926245 18.09.2002A3
EP0926245 30.06.1999A2
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT277197T 15.10.2004T
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2255146 22.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19757300 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2229440T 16.04.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE19757300 22.12.1997