blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0926245

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 21.12.2004
 BELapse: 31.12.2004
 CH 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 22.12.2004
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IELapse: 22.09.2004
 IT 
 LI 
 NLLapse: 22.09.2004
 SELapse: 22.12.2004
Examination procedure15.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted22.09.2004
Opposition procedure23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.09.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:30.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:30.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:30.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981221
 
Event date:18.09.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:18.09.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030227
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:22.09.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040922
 
Event date:22.09.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20040922
 
Event date:22.09.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:22.09.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:30.09.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:30.09.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE
 
Event date:13.10.2004 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20040922
 
Event date:20.10.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:28.10.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59811990
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20041028
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041221
 
Event date:22.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20041222
 
Event date:22.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20041222
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:01.04.2005 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:16.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2229440 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:20.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:30.06.2005 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS G.M.B.H.
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:12.08.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:14.09.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050623
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS G.M.B.H.
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:25.06.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH
Free Format Text:ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH#SANDHOFER STRASSE 112-132#68305 MANNHEIM-WALDHOF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH#SANDHOFER STRASSE 112-132#68305 MANNHEIM-WALDHOF (DE)
 
Event date:15.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCAR
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)
 
Event date:24.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:17.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:20.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20171120
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20171128
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20171025
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20171218
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20171221
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180105
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:21.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59811990 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:28.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:09.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20181220
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20181220