Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0935061

EP0935061 - Stationary gas engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OHG
Achenseestrasse 1-3
6200 Jenbach / AT
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co. OHG
Achenseestrasse 1-3
6200 Jenbach / AT
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
GE Jenbacher Aktiengesellschaft
Achenseestrasse 1-3
6200 Jenbach / AT
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
Jenbacher Aktiengesellschaft
Achenseestrasse 1-3
6200 Jenbach/Tirol / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Henkel, Werner Ing.
Haus Nr. 488c
6233 Kramsach / AT
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Torggler, Paul Norbert , et al
Torggler & Hofinger
Patentanwälte
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Torggler, Paul Norbert, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556
6021 Innsbruck / AT
Former [1999/32]Torggler, Paul, Dr. , et al
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Application number, filing date98124381.922.12.1998
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateAT1998000020905.02.1998         Original published format: AT 20998
[1999/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0935061
Date:11.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0935061
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0935061
Date:25.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02F1/14, F02F1/16, F02B77/04
[2000/17]
Former International [1999/32]F02F1/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbrennungsmotor, insbesondere stationärer Gasmotor[1999/32]
English:Stationary gas engine[1999/32]
French:Moteur stationnaire à combustion interne à gaz[1999/32]
Examination procedure16.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
27.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2003Fee for grant paid
22.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.11.2004  30.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken
Abteilung KR-P
D - 51057 Köln / DE
 02  24.11.2004  10.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Wärtsilä Finland OY
Tarhaajantie 2
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Wahl, Hendrik, et al
Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger
Wotanstrasse 64
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  17.11.2004  30.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken
Abteilung KR-P
D - 51057 Köln / DE
 02  24.11.2004  10.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Wärtsilä Finland OY
Tarhaajantie 2
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Wahl, Hendrik, et al
Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64
80639 München / DE
Former [2006/24]
Opponent(s)01  17.11.2004  30.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken
Abteilung KR-P
D - 51057 Köln / DE
 02  24.11.2004  10.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Wärtsilä Finland OY
Tarhaajantie 2
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Wahl, Hendrik, et al
Zipse & Habersack Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64
D-80639 München / DE
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  17.11.2004  30.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken
Abteilung KR-P
D - 51057 Köln / DE
 02  24.11.2004   
Wärtsilä Finland OY
Tarhaajantie 2
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Gustafsson, Aulis Valdemar
AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy P.O. Box 230
00101 Helsinki / FI
03.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.04.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/23]
19.01.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.01.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]CH672353  (SULZER AG) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, column L, line 30 - column R, line 37; figure . *;
 [Y]DE3413971  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 34; figure - *;
 [A]WO9703280  (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]) [A] 1,3 * page 7, line 6 - line 20 * * page 13, line 3 - line 28 * * page 15, line 13 - line 23; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]US2624328  (GRINHAM EDWARD G, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]FR2028566  (MAHLE KG) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]DE3530875  (MAK MASCHINENBAU KRUPP [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 6; figure - *
by applicantDE3413971
 GB1478379