blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0928967 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0928967



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 103
21.01.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.02.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.01.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
01.09.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.09.2003 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
26.06.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.05.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.02.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
17.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.12.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
22.12.1998 Description Search / examination 9
22.12.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.12.1998 Priority document Search / examination 16
22.12.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6