blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0928967
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3848993BGlobal Dossier 22.11.2006B2
JPH11194108 21.07.1999A
Priority number Date
JP1345098 06.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0928967Global Dossier 17.03.2004B1
EP0928967 17.05.2000A3
EP0928967 14.07.1999A2
Priority number Date
JP1345098 06.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1151375C 26.05.2004C
CN1224164 28.07.1999A
Priority number Date
JP1345098 06.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69822429T 13.01.2005T2
DE69822429D 22.04.2004D1
Priority number Date
JP1345098 06.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6377896 23.04.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP1345098 06.01.1998