Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928967

EP0928967 - Method and apparatus for the determination of a substance coexisting with another substance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD.
57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD.
57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Yoshiharu
Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd. 57, Nishiaketa-cho
Higashikujo, Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi/fu / JP
02 / Okuda, Hisashi
Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd. 57, Nishiaketa-cho
Higashikujo, Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi/fu / JP
[1999/28]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Postfach 40 14 68
80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124420.522.12.1998
[1999/28]
Priority number, dateJP1998001345006.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1345098
[1999/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0928967
Date:14.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0928967
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0928967
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/487, G01N33/49
[1999/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/04]
Former [1999/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung einer mit einer anderen Substanz koexistierenden Substanz[2003/40]
English:Method and apparatus for the determination of a substance coexisting with another substance[1999/28]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la détermination d'une substance coexistante avec une autre substance[1999/28]
Former [1999/28]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Feststellung einer mit einer anderen Substanz koexistierenden Substanz
Examination procedure03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
17.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2004Fee for grant paid
08.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4221848  (SALZSIEDER ECKARD DR [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 2, line 34 - line 38 * * page 2, line 44 - line 51 * * page 2, line 59 - line 66 * * page 3, line 10 - line 16 *;
 [A]US4436812  (ENDOH KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 23 *;
 [A]EP0404594  (COLIN ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 8 *