Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0926591

EP0926591 - Network-access management system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.08.2006  [2006/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagatomo, Shoichi, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Intell. Prop. C. 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
 [2005/34]
Former [1999/26]01 / Nagatomo, Shoichi, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Intell. Prop. C. 2-1, sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124520.222.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateJP1997036153826.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36153897
JP1997036153926.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36153997
JP1998006753118.03.1998         Original published format: JP 6753198
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926591
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926591
Date:28.07.1999
[1999/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0926591
Date:24.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F17/30
[1999/30]
Former International [1999/26]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/14]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Netzzugriffsverwaltung[1999/26]
English:Network-access management system and method[1999/26]
French:Système et procédé pour la gestion de l'accès à un réseau[1999/26]
Examination procedure22.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/26]
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2005Fee for grant paid
13.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9741673  (FREEDOM OF INFORMATION INC) [X] 1-3,14,15,21 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - line 26 * * page 7, line 8 - line 27 * * page 9, line 26 - line 34 * * page 11, line 10 - line 19 * [Y] 6,7,13,18;
 [YA]WO9715889  (WEGENER INTERNET PROJECTS B V ;HOND MAURICE DE (NL)) [Y] 6,7,13,18 * abstract * * page 7, line 10 - line 30 * * page 11, line 9 - page 13, line 30 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,14,21;
 [X]  - KAMBA T ET AL, "ANATAGONOMY: a personalized newspaper on the World Wide Web", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HUMAN-COMPUTER STUDIES, (19970101), vol. 46, pages 789 - 803, XP002086827 [X] 1,14,21 * abstract * * page 796, line 1 - page 797, line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/ijhc.1996.0113
 [A]  - AYERS ET AL, "Using Graphic History in Browsing the World Wide Web", INTERNATIONAL WORLD WIDE WEB CONFERENCE, (19951201), pages 451 - 459, XP002082850 [A] 1,6,14,18,21 * abstract * * page 452, column R, line 34 - line 45 * * page 455, column L, line 9 - page 456, column L, line 3 * * page 456, column R, line 22 - line 32 * * page 458, column L, line 22 - column R, line 9 * * figure 1 *
 [A]  - CROSSLEY M ET AL, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL INTERNET DEVELOPMENTS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (19970401), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 179 - 193, XP000703569 [A] 1,3,6,7,13-15,18,21 * page 185, column L, line 1 - line 14 * * page 189, column R, line 1 - line 19 * * page 189, column R, line 37 - page 191, column L, line 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018657329207