blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0925943

EP0925943 - Electrophotographic apparatus and test pattern recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujii, Kenichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Uchiyama, Seiji
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98124660.623.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateJP1997035983326.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35983397
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0925943
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0925943
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0925943
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/47, G06K15/12, B41J29/393
[2000/02]
CPC:
B41J2/471 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/26]B41J2/47
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrophotographisches Gerät und Prüfmustereraufzeichnungsverfahren[1999/26]
English:Electrophotographic apparatus and test pattern recording method[1999/26]
French:Appareil electrophotographique et méthode d'enregistrement d'un motif de test[1999/26]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2003Fee for grant paid
21.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT03.03.2004
[2008/12]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0734154  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,9,10,13,14,20,22,23,26 * abstract * * column 17, line 32 - column 20, line 20 * * figures 1,2,12 * [A] 3,15,16;
 [PX]JPH10217539  ;
 [A]JPH0915924  ;
 US5774169  [ ] (IKEGAWA AKIHITO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 7, line 26 - line 27 * * figures 5,6 *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10217539 A 19980818 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [PX] 1-26 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 43, Database accession no. 1998-500512 [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09015924 A 19970117 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 4,5,8,9,11,12,17,18,24,25 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.