blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0932031

EP0932031 - Fuel gauge unit for a fuel tank [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8315 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8315 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagase, Yuji, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku
Nagoya, Aichi-ken 453-8515 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Shogo, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku
Nagoya, Aichi-ken 453-8515 / JP
03 / Kouchi, Hiroyoshi, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku
Nagoya, Aichi-ken 453-8515 / JP
04 / Kobayashi, Kazuyuki, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku
Nagoya, Aichi-ken 453-8515 / JP
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[1999/30]
Application number, filing date98124840.429.12.1998
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateJP1998002916327.01.1998         Original published format: JP 2916398
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0932031
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0932031
Date:26.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01F23/34
[1999/30]
CPC:
G01F23/34 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/14]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffmesser für einen Kraftsofftank[1999/30]
English:Fuel gauge unit for a fuel tank[1999/30]
French:Jauge de carburant pour un réservoir de carburant[1999/30]
Examination procedure12.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
27.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2001Fee for grant paid
28.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09222348  ;
 [A]US4441364  (MONTIE DOUGLAS L [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4574631  (JOHNSON JR STANLEY A [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 58; figures 4-6 *;
 [Y]US4790184  (NAKANISHI YUTAKA [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 16; figure 4A *;
 [A]US5025764  (KOBAYASHI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 2* column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 58; figures 2,5 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, & JP09222348 A 19970826 (KUBOTA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.