blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0858210

EP0858210 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohsawa, Hidefumi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Hirabayashi, Yasuji
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Yoshida, Tadashi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98200137.205.03.1991
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateJP1990005452805.03.1990         Original published format: JP 5452890
JP1990005452905.03.1990         Original published format: JP 5452990
JP1990014370401.06.1990         Original published format: JP 14370490
JP1990014370501.06.1990         Original published format: JP 14370590
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0858210
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0858210
Date:17.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/46
[1998/33]
CPC:
H04N1/642 (EP,US); H03M7/12 (EP,US); H04N19/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1998/33]
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsgerät[1998/33]
English:Image processing apparatus[1998/33]
French:Appareil pour le traitement d'images[1998/33]
Examination procedure24.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
29.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2003Fee for grant paid
10.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91301822.2  / EP0446018
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Request for further processing for:08.09.2000Request for further processing filed
08.09.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.09.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FR17.12.2003
IT17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
LU05.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
DE18.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2006/14]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
FR17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
LU05.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
DE18.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
LU05.03.2004
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
DE18.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2005/12]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
DE18.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
DK17.03.2004
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT17.12.2003
BE17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/46]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
ES28.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT17.12.2003
CH17.12.2003
LI17.12.2003
NL17.12.2003
GR17.03.2004
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT17.12.2003
SE17.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE17.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP0376679  (CANON KK [JP])[PA] 1
ExaminationUS4694352
 EP0283715
 US4893195
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.