blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0875216 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0875216



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
19.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
06.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
14.05.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.05.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.01.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.01.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.11.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2002 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
01.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
01.03.2002 Description Search / examination 2
01.03.2002 Description Search / examination 4
01.03.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.09.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
10.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
13.11.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.03.2000 Invitation to file authorisation (further representative authorised) Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
23.09.1998 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
20.03.1998 Description Search / examination 11
20.03.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Drawings Search / examination 5
20.03.1998 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Priority document Search / examination 24
20.03.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
05.03.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.1998 Drawings Search / examination 5
05.03.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
05.03.1998 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
05.03.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
05.03.1998 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15