Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0875216

EP0875216 - Fluid actuated stent delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth
Minnesota 55442 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
SCHNEIDER (USA) INC.
5905 Nathan Lane
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fiedler, Gary R.
6030 Hemlock Lane
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/17]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [1998/45]Jansen, Götz
Schneider (Europe) AG, Ackerstrasse 6
8180 Bülach / CH
Application number, filing date98200670.205.03.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateUS1997081607713.03.1997         Original published format: US 816077
[1998/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0875216
Date:04.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0875216
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0875216
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/50]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsgesteuertes Stentanbringungssystem[1998/45]
English:Fluid actuated stent delivery system[1998/45]
French:Système de mise en place d'un stent actionné par fluide[1998/45]
Examination procedure05.03.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
22.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
13.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
10.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
31.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2003Fee for grant paid
24.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
ES20.10.2003
[2004/46]
Former [2004/29]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
DK09.10.2003
SE09.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT09.07.2003
BE09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
SE09.10.2003
Former [2004/22]AT09.07.2003
CH09.07.2003
LI09.07.2003
SE09.10.2003
Former [2004/16]AT09.07.2003
SE09.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0705578  (FOGAZZI DI VENTURELLI ANDREA & [IT]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 11; figure - *;
 [A]WO9511055  (SCIMED LIFESYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11 * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 26; figure - *;
 [A]US5534007  (ST GERMAIN JON P [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 42 - line 59; figure - * * column 5, line 7 - line 28 *
by applicantUS4954126
 US4655771
 US5061275
 US5445646