Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0858058

EP0858058 - Co-dispensing snack food product and beverages from a vending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RECOT, INC.
5000 Hopyard Road, Suite 460
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
[1998/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Center, John L.
3818 High Summit
Dallas, Texas 75244 / US
02 / Stalder, James William
4146 Creekdale Drive
Dallas, Texas 75229 / US
03 / Elliott, Dale W.
847 Old Gin Road
Ennis, Texas 75119 / US
04 / Pennington, John michael
54 Robins Nest
Hickory Creek, Texas 75065 / US
[1998/33]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/33]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date98200845.011.08.1995
[1998/33]
Priority number, dateUS1994028953712.08.1994         Original published format: US 289537
US1995041960510.04.1995         Original published format: US 419605
US1995048266007.06.1995         Original published format: US 482660
[1998/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0858058
Date:12.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0858058
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F9/00
[1998/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/33]
TitleGerman:Verkaufsautomat für Getränke und Imbissprodukte[1998/33]
English:Co-dispensing snack food product and beverages from a vending machine[1998/33]
French:Distribution conjointe d'un-cas et de boissons a partir d'un distributeur automatique[1998/33]
Examination procedure28.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
03.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
08.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/36]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95929480.2  / EP0775349
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200410   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0411769  (CMB FOODCAN PLC [GB]) [A] 1-24 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4899790  (ODENTHAL HEINZ F [DE]) [A] 1-24 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4326568  (BURTON CHARLES A, et al) [A] 1-24 * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4110368  (AUTOMATEN AG [CH]) [A] 1-24 * column 3, lines 16-38; figures 1,6; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5176287  (SURIS VLADIMIR [US]) [A] 1-24 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4730750  (FICKEN LEONARD A [US]) [A] 1-24 * figure 2; claim 1 *