blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0872197

EP0872197 - A low air loss patient support system providing active feedback pressure sensing and correction capabilities for use as a bed mattress and a wheelchair seating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hagopian Mark
418 St. Andrews Drive Belleair
Florida 34616 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
Hagopian Mark
418 St. Andrews Drive
Belleair, Florida 34616 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Quintelier, Claude, et al
Gevers
Intellectual Property House
Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Quintelier, Claude, et al
GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date98200855.918.03.1998
[1998/43]
Priority number, dateUS1997082310224.03.1997         Original published format: US 823102
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0872197
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0872197
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61G7/057, A47C27/10
[2000/19]
CPC:
A61G7/05776 (EP,US); A61G5/1045 (EP,US); A61G5/1091 (EP,US);
A61G7/05784 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1998/43]A47C27/10
Designated contracting states[2001/03]
Former [1998/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zwangsbelüftbares Patientenauflagesystem mit Rückkopplung zum Verstellen des Drucks für Matratze oder Rollstuhlsitz[1998/43]
English:A low air loss patient support system providing active feedback pressure sensing and correction capabilities for use as a bed mattress and a wheelchair seating system[1998/43]
French:Système de support d'un patient à faible perte d'air et à réglage rétroactif de la pression pour matelas ou siège de fauteuil roulant[1998/43]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
17.02.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
11.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/34]
01.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4280487  (JACKSON BARRY N) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *;
 [DX]US5103518  (GILROY KEITH [US], et al) [DX] 1 * column 9, line 16 - line 22 *;
 [A]EP0528666  (TEASDALE HOSPITAL EQUIPMENT LI [GB], et al) [A] 1* figure 2 *;
 [DA]US5267364  (VOLK CRAIG K [US]) [DA] 1-14 * column 4, line 53 - line 61 *;
 [DA]US5533217  (HOLDREDGE TERRY K [US]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 19 - line 33; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0757907  (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 22 - line 32 *
by applicantUS4685163
 US4833614
 US4864671
 US5010608
 US5282286
 US5369828
 US5500965
 US5509155
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.