Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0876037

EP0876037 - Terminal, method of automatic call-back and telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cellon France SAS
Route d'Angers
72100 Le Mans / FR
[2003/13]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Henon, Alexandre
Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156 Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
02 / Thauvin, Philippe
Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156 Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Kohn, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn
30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Kohn, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2002/50]Kohn, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [1998/45]Chaffraix, Jean
Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98201194.215.04.1998
[1998/45]
Priority number, dateFR1997000538230.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705382
[1998/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0876037
Date:04.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0876037
Date:14.04.1999
[1999/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/274
[1999/15]
Former International [1998/45]H04M1/274, H04M1/72, H04Q7/32, H04M3/48
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/52]
Former [1998/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Endgerät, Verfahren für automatisches Rückruf- und Telekommunikationssystem[1998/45]
English:Terminal, method of automatic call-back and telecommunications system[1998/45]
French:Terminal, procédé de rappel automatique et système de télécommunications[1998/45]
Examination procedure14.10.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
08.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
03.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3885108  (ZOCK JOSEPH) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 10, line 23 *;
 [X]GR90100888  (FILIPPAKOPOULOS NIKOLAOS;POLITAKIS KONSTANTINOS) [X] 1-6,8-10,12 * page 5, line 47 - page 9, line 10 *;
 [XA]EP0453608  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,9,12 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,8,10;
 [X]JPH0823370  ;
 [X]JPS61189055  ;
 [X]JPH06104969  ;
 [A]WO8404219  (PUSHMAN HUGH ASS [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 31 * * claims 1,5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870117), vol. 011, no. 017, Database accession no. (E - 471), [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940714), vol. 018, no. 375, Database accession no. (E - 1578), [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract *
 [XA]  - MINKOFF R M, "AUTO PHONE REDIAL IN AN RF ENVIRONMENT", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19920801), vol. 16, pages 3 - 6, XP000310321 [X] 1,3-9,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 2,10