Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0872677

EP0872677 - Pipe clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J. van Walraven B.V.
Industrieweg 5
3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
J. van Walraven B.V.
Industrieweg 5
NL-3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL
Inventor(s)01 / van Walraven, Jan
Prins Bernhardlaan 6
3641 GP Mijdrecht / NL
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date98201243.717.04.1998
[1998/43]
Priority number, dateDE1997206912U17.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29706912 U
[1998/43]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0872677
Date:21.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0872677
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16L3/10
[1998/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/43]
TitleGerman:Rohrschelle[1998/43]
English:Pipe clamp[1998/43]
French:Collier de serrage[1998/43]
Examination procedure21.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
18.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29616412U  (SIKLA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,11,14 * figures 1-3; claims 1-18 *;
 [A]DE8806714U  (FLAMCO B.V.) [A] 1,11,14 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE9214700U  (MAECHTLE-WOEHLER) [A] 1,11,14 * figures 1-7; claims 1-12 *