Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0867249

EP0867249 - Chuck [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/40]chuck
[2002/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POWER TOOL HOLDERS, Inc.
16 West Main Street
Christiana, DE 19702 / US
[2001/50]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
POWER TOOL HOLDERS INCORPORATED
Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Steadings, Stephen W.
129 Inlet Reach
Seneca, SC 29678 / US
02 / Barton, Christopher B.
573 Patterson Road
Seneca, SC 29678 / US
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date98201507.502.08.1994
[1998/40]
Priority number, dateUS1993010606313.08.1993         Original published format: US 106063
[1998/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0867249
Date:30.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0867249
Date:10.03.1999
[1999/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0867249
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/12
[1998/40]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/40]
TitleGerman:Futter[1998/40]
English:Chuck[2002/45]
French:Mandrin[1998/40]
Former [1998/40]chuck
Examination procedure02.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/40]
14.03.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
15.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2002Fee for grant paid
04.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94924557.5  / EP0713431
Divisional application(s)EP02078226.4   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 09.08.2002
EP02078259.5  / EP1270119
EP06020113.4  / EP1777025
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
[2008/12]
Former [2006/14]CH06.11.2002
FR06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
Former [2003/39]CH06.11.2002
LI06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
Former [2003/30]NL06.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9112914  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 3 - line 6; figure 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]US5215317  (JORDAN PAUL T [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 33 - line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9011860  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]EP0436108  (JACOBS CHUCK TECH CORP [US])