EP0877272 - Improvements in or relating to spatial light modulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, TX 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED P.O. Box 655474, 13500 Central Expressway Dallas, TX 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florence, James M. 4 Walnut Creek Place Richardson, TX 75080 / US | 02 /
Huffman, James 815 Edgefield Drive Richardson, TX / US | 03 /
Miller, Rodney 7001 Napa Valley Frisco, TX 75035 / US | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [1998/46] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., PO Box 5069 Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98201538.0 | 04.05.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | US19970045986P | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 45986 P | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877272 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877272 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
G02B26/0841 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/41] |
Former [1999/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für räumliche Lichtmodulatoren | [2001/39] | English: | Improvements in or relating to spatial light modulators | [1998/46] | French: | Améliorations concernant les modulateurs de lumière spatiaux | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/46] | Verbesserungen für r umliche Lichtmodulatoren | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.06.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 | 28.06.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 | 28.06.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 | 28.06.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 | 28.06.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.06.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   09.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.07.2002 | NL | 31.07.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 31.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5061049 (HORNBECK LARRY J [US]) [DA] 1-3,6-8,11 * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 3 * * column 25, line 59 - column 26, line 13; figures 1,39A,39B *; | [A]EP0469293 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 30 - line 57; figures 2,4,8 *; | [A]EP0694801 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 11; figures 1,2,4-12 *; | [DA]US5535047 (HORNBECK LARRY J [US]) [DA] 1-11 * column 6, line 38 - line 65 * * column 9, line 21 - line 45; figures 2,4,5 *; | [PX]EP0813089 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-4* column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 28; figures 3,4 * |