Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885770

EP0885770 - Vertically movable loading platform provided with railings, for mounting to a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DHOLLANDIA, naamloze vennootschap
Zoomstraat 9
9160 Lokeren / BE
[2001/32]
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
NV NUYTS ORB
Veedijk 42
2300 Turnhout / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Nuyts, Henri
Heidevenstraat 4
2300 Turnhout / BE
[1998/52]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/28]Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Former [1998/52]Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir. , et al
HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146
2596 HG Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98201629.720.05.1998
[1998/52]
Priority number, dateBE1997000045323.05.1997         Original published format: BE 9700453
[1998/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0885770
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885770
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/44
[1998/52]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/35]
Former [1998/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vertikal bewegbare Plattform mit Geländer, zur Montage auf einem Fahrzeug[1998/52]
English:Vertically movable loading platform provided with railings, for mounting to a vehicle[1998/52]
French:Plate-forme à déplacement vertical équipé avec garde-corps, pour montage sur un véhicule[1998/52]
Examination procedure19.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/28]
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2002Fee for grant paid
02.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB20.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/22]GB20.05.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2135959  (DIESEL EQUIP) [A] 1 * page 1, line 41 - line 101 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4214849  (DOWNING HAROLD A [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2659607  (RHONE ALPES DIRECTION RGLE POS [FR]);
 [A]US5449031  (BURKLUND FRED A [US])