blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0884172

EP0884172 - Surface covering element and surface covering, in particular a floor covering element or a wall covering element, and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2001 [2001/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rotterdamse Kurkenfabriek B.V.
Industrieweg 15
3044 AS Rotterdam / NL
[1998/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Fässler, Fridolin David
Grauschafmatt 3
8841 Gross / CH
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus
Octrooibureau LIOC B.V.
P.O. Box 13363
3507 LJ Utrecht / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus
Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. P.O. Box 13363
3507 LJ Utrecht / NL
Application number, filing date98201860.805.06.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateCH1997000138409.06.1997         Original published format: CH 138497
[1998/51]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884172
Date:16.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884172
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:B32B21/04, E04F15/00, E04F15/022, E04F13/00
[1999/47]
CPC:
B32B21/04 (EP); B32B21/042 (US); B32B21/14 (US);
B32B9/02 (US); B32B9/042 (US); E04F15/02 (EP);
E04F15/181 (EP); B32B2471/00 (US); B32B2607/02 (US);
E04F2290/043 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1998/51]B32B21/04, E04F15/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/17]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flächenbelagelement und Flächenbelag, insbesondere Bodenbelagelement oder Wandbelagelement, und Verfahren hierzu[1998/51]
English:Surface covering element and surface covering, in particular a floor covering element or a wall covering element, and method[1998/51]
French:Elément de revêtement de surface et revêtement de surface, en particulier un élément de revêtement de sol ou de murs, et méthode[1998/51]
Examination procedure10.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/49]
21.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.03.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.03.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR1096104  (BARBIER & CIE G) [Y] 10-14* page 1, column L, line 41 - column R, line 37; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2416792  (TECHNISYNTHESE SARL [FR]) [X] 1-5 * claim - *;
 [X]FR2537635  (REGNIER ETS MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE9111381U  (GÜRTLER, HUBERT) [X] 1,5 * page 4, line 15 - page 18; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE9410972U  (RUDOLF ROST SPERRHOLZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]DE4313834  (LOBA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10-14 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3631390
 WO9606248
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.